NY A09591 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating a comprehensive website of small business and minority and women-owned business enterprise assistance; requires the department of economic development to review its existing websites, directories, and registries offering assistance to small businesses and minority and women-owned business enterprises and consolidate them into a comprehensive website.
Title
Relates to creating a comprehensive website of small business and minority and women-owned business enterprise assistance; requires the department of economic development to review its existing websites, directories, and registries offering assistance to small businesses and minority and women-owned business enterprises and consolidate them into a comprehensive website.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.249 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1865 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6959A |
2016-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.708 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | print number 9591a |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-03-21 | Assembly | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S06959 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9591A