NY A09580 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - substituted by s7399a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - substituted by s7399a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Lynbrook to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Police Officer Ronald J. Fleury who is employed by such village.
Title
Authorizes the village of Lynbrook to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Police Officer Ronald J. Fleury who is employed by such village.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s7399a |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.54 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.54 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | print number 9580a |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07399 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.437