NY A09569 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7060a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7060a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes New York Kali Mandir, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes New York Kali Mandir, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s7060a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.324 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | print number 9569a |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07060 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.434