NY A09564 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits required service by police officers in an undercover assignment or capacity to no more than thirty-six months.
Title
Limits required service by police officers in an undercover assignment or capacity to no more than thirty-six months.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | tabled |
2014-11-21 | Senate | vetoed memo.505 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1262 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6726 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.869 |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06726 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9564