NY A09534 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s6578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s6578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates employees of the village court of the village of Port Chester serving as uniformed court officers as peace officers.
Title
Designates employees of the village court of the village of Port Chester serving as uniformed court officers as peace officers.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s6578 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.402 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.402 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06578 (Same As) 2016-09-29 - VETOED MEMO.217