NY A09534 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-15)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - signed chap.14
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-15)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - signed chap.14
Summary
Establishes felony offenses relating to endangering the welfare of an incompetent or physically disabled person; defines "incompetent or physically disabled person" to mean an individual who is unable to care for himself or herself because of a physical disability, mental disease or defect.
Title
Establishes felony offenses relating to endangering the welfare of an incompetent or physically disabled person; defines "incompetent or physically disabled person" to mean an individual who is unable to care for himself or herself because of a physical disability, mental disease or defect.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | signed chap.14 | |
2010-03-12 | delivered to governor | |
2010-03-08 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-03-08 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-03-08 | 3RD READING CAL.192 | |
2010-03-08 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6728 | |
2010-02-01 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2010-02-01 | delivered to senate | |
2010-02-01 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-21 | advanced to third reading cal.648 | |
2010-01-20 | reported | |
2010-01-13 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S6728 (Same As) 2010-03-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9534
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09534&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |