NY A09533 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7229b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7229b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes towns with a population between fifty-six thousand seven hundred and fifty-six thousand eight hundred based upon the two thousand ten federal census to enact a hospitality business investment real property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes towns with a population between fifty-six thousand seven hundred and fifty-six thousand eight hundred based upon the two thousand ten federal census to enact a hospitality business investment real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s7229b |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.560 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | print number 9533b |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | print number 9533a |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07229 (Same As) 2014-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.470