NY A09492 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - signed chap.543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the department of environmental conservation to create a report outlining a plan to hydraulically contain and remediate the Navy Grumman plume emanating of contaminants and chemicals in the underground aquifer and drinking water of the southeastern portion of Nassau county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the department of environmental conservation to create a report outlining a plan to hydraulically contain and remediate the Navy Grumman plume emanating of contaminants and chemicals in the underground aquifer and drinking water of the southeastern portion of Nassau county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-29Senatesigned chap.543
2014-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2014-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1685
2014-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7832
2014-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2014-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.559
2014-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.559
2014-06-19Assemblyreported
2014-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2014-06-03Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2014-05-02Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S07832 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9492

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback