NY A09476 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - substituted by s6948a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - substituted by s6948a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a hospital supplemental reimbursement rate adjustment for enhanced safety net hospitals.
Title
Establishes a hospital supplemental reimbursement rate adjustment for enhanced safety net hospitals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s6948a |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.520 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | print number 9476a |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06948 (Same As) 2016-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.305