NY A09424 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - signed chap.337
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - signed chap.337
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to temporary retail permits issued by the state liquor authority.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to temporary retail permits issued by the state liquor authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | Senate | signed chap.337 |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1094 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6974 |
2014-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.726 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06974 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9424