NY A09409 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Moves the date of the meeting of the electors; changes the method for the transmission of the certificates of vote to align with federal law.
Title
Moves the date of the meeting of the electors; changes the method for the transmission of the certificates of vote to align with federal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.380 |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | reported |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S08464 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING