NY A09403 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a New York state physical fitness and activity education campaign.
Title
Establishes a New York state physical fitness and activity education campaign.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s7000 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.474 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-04-25 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07000 (Same As) 2014-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.520