NY A09391 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - substituted by s6529
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - substituted by s6529
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination, intimidation and retaliation against students of proprietary schools who file a written complaint or exercise their right of private action against a proprietary school.
Title
Prohibits discrimination, intimidation and retaliation against students of proprietary schools who file a written complaint or exercise their right of private action against a proprietary school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Assembly | substituted by s6529 |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.463 |
2022-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-02-23 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06529 (Same As) 2022-05-04 - SIGNED CHAP.182