NY A09387 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - signed chap.383
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - signed chap.383
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to maintaining public data of open code violations in New York city housing authority developments.
Title
Relates to maintaining public data of open code violations in New York city housing authority developments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-19 | Assembly | signed chap.383 |
2022-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.689 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S72A |
2022-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.346 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.346 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | print number 9387a |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2022-02-23 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S00072 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9387A