NY A09386 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s6852
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s6852
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends Warren county's additional mortgage recording tax authorization until December 1, 2018.
Title
Extends Warren county's additional mortgage recording tax authorization until December 1, 2018.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s6852 |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.698 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06852 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.190