NY A09338 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s8318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s8318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the superintendent of financial services to maintain and annually update a list of financial institutions that waive wire transfer or processing fees associated with Holocaust reparations payments.
Title
Requires the superintendent of financial services to maintain and annually update a list of financial institutions that waive wire transfer or processing fees associated with Holocaust reparations payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s8318 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.343 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.343 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-02-23 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S08318 (Same As) 2022-08-10 - SIGNED CHAP.493