NY A09338 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-14 - substituted by s6501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-14 - substituted by s6501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from December 1, 2012 until December 1, 2015, the expiration of the authority of the county of Hamilton to impose a mortgage tax.
Title
Extends from December 1, 2012 until December 1, 2015, the expiration of the authority of the county of Hamilton to impose a mortgage tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s6501 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.196 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-02-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06501 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.216