NY A09334 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s7739c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s7739c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Suffolk to transfer ownership of certain parkland under the James Creek to the town of Southold for management and administration.
Title
Authorizes the county of Suffolk to transfer ownership of certain parkland under the James Creek to the town of Southold for management and administration.
Sponsors
Asm. Jodi Giglio [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s7739c |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.559 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | print number 9334b |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | print number 9334a |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2022-02-23 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07739 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.711