NY A09277 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - substituted by s8583a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - substituted by s8583a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the remainder of the balance of certain funds paid to the recording officer of the county of Essex, to be used towards expenditures for county and public safety facility projects; extends certain provisions relating thereto to December 1, 2027.
Title
Directs the remainder of the balance of certain funds paid to the recording officer of the county of Essex, to be used towards expenditures for county and public safety facility projects; extends certain provisions relating thereto to December 1, 2027.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8583a |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.343 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | print number 9277a |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2024-02-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08583 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - returned to senate