NY A09258 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6942
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6942
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the duty of the town and city clerks when an application for a marriage license is made; provides that in cities or towns, the verified statements and affidavits may be made before any regular clerk or designee of the clerk's office.
Title
Relates to the duty of the town and city clerks when an application for a marriage license is made; provides that in cities or towns, the verified statements and affidavits may be made before any regular clerk or designee of the clerk's office.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6942 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | restored to third reading |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | amend by restoring to original print 9258 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9258a |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2014-06-12 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2014-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1348 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6942 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.852 |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-04 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06942 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9258