NY A09194 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - substituted by s6427a
Hearing: Feb 8 @ 7:00 pm Assembly Aging Committee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - substituted by s6427a
Hearing: Feb 8 @ 7:00 pm Assembly Aging Committee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing eligible surviving members of the household to apply for a transfer of the head of household's benefit under the SCRIE and DRIE programs.
Title
Relates to authorizing eligible surviving members of the household to apply for a transfer of the head of household's benefit under the SCRIE and DRIE programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Assembly | substituted by s6427a |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.17 |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.17 |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S06427 (Same As) 2016-04-08 - SIGNED CHAP.31