NY A09167 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - substituted by s6386a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - substituted by s6386a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes service animals or therapy dogs to accompany victims of domestic violence at residential programs whenever such accompaniment is reasonable under the circumstances.
Title
Authorizes service animals or therapy dogs to accompany victims of domestic violence at residential programs whenever such accompaniment is reasonable under the circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Assembly | substituted by s6386a |
2016-02-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.404 |
2016-02-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S06386 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - SIGNED CHAP.7