NY A09166 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the time for New York city marshals to exercise the same functions, powers and duties as sheriffs with respect to the execution of money judgments of the supreme and family courts of the city of New York.
Title
Extends the time for New York city marshals to exercise the same functions, powers and duties as sheriffs with respect to the execution of money judgments of the supreme and family courts of the city of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-02-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-02-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.322 |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | reported |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |