NY A09154 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.448
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.448
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to accelerated death benefits under a life insurance policy and the right of the policy owner or certificate holder to rescind the request for such payments at any time during the process of application for said benefits.
Title
Relates to accelerated death benefits under a life insurance policy and the right of the policy owner or certificate holder to rescind the request for such payments at any time during the process of application for said benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | signed chap.448 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1102 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6507A |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.846 |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | print number 9154a |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06507 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9154A