NY A09137 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.257
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.257
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the 149th Street Grand Concourse subway station the "149th Street-Hostos station".
Title
Renames the 149th Street Grand Concourse subway station the "149th Street-Hostos station".
Sponsors
Asm. Amanda Septimo [D] | Asm. Maritza Davila [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Manny De Los Santos [D] |
Asm. Yudelka Tapia [D] | Asm. Chantel Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.257 |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1226 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8294A |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.624 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | print number 9137a |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08294 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9137A