NY A09129 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - signed chap.410
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - signed chap.410
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of provisions relating to a restricted dental faculty license; requires a report proposing legislation to address the shortage of New York trained dentists pursuing academic careers in New York.
Title
Extends the expiration of provisions relating to a restricted dental faculty license; requires a report proposing legislation to address the shortage of New York trained dentists pursuing academic careers in New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Senate | signed chap.410 |
2016-10-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1322 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6552A |
2016-06-02 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-06-02 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9129a |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-24 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2016-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.423 |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-29 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06552 (Same As) 2016-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9129A