NY A09122 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the constitution relating to veterans with disabilities; provides that where a veteran has been appointed or promoted from an eligible list on which he or she was allowed additional credit as a veteran and he or she is subsequently classified as a disabled veteran, he or she shall thereafter be entitled to credits due a disabled veteran less the number of credits allowed for the prior appointment.
Title
Amends the constitution relating to veterans with disabilities; provides that where a veteran has been appointed or promoted from an eligible list on which he or she was allowed additional credit as a veteran and he or she is subsequently classified as a disabled veteran, he or she shall thereafter be entitled to credits due a disabled veteran less the number of credits allowed for the prior appointment.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | enacting clause stricken | |
2010-01-06 | referred to governmental employees | |
2009-10-07 | opinion referred to judiciary | |
2009-09-08 | to attorney-general for opinion | |
2009-09-04 | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S6462 (Same As) 2010-03-29 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN