NY A09118 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-14)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-14)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to contributions made to family tuition accounts; provides that a taxpayer may deposit a sum derived from his or her personal income tax refund into college savings accounts.
Title
Relates to contributions made to family tuition accounts; provides that a taxpayer may deposit a sum derived from his or her personal income tax refund into college savings accounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.454 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.928 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6942 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.550 |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06942 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9118