NY A09118 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Gives the commissioner of agriculture and markets the power to establish a federal food safety compliance assistance program to support farmers in complying with federal food safety rules.
Title
Gives the commissioner of agriculture and markets the power to establish a federal food safety compliance assistance program to support farmers in complying with federal food safety rules.
Sponsors
Asm. William Magee [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.547 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1404 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7037 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.82 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.82 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S07037 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9118