NY A09117 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - amended on third reading 9117a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - amended on third reading 9117a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to facilitating appellate review of rulings that implicate issues of public concern.
Title
Relates to facilitating appellate review of rulings that implicate issues of public concern.
Sponsors
Asm. Catalina Cruz [D] | Asm. Alex Bores [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Anna Kelles [D] |
Asm. Chantel Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9117a |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.321 |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | reported |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08688 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - referred to codes