NY A09105 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to advancing grid enhancement technologies; allows the department of public service to approve requests from distribution companies to develop grid enhancement technologies; requires distribution companies to submit a compliance filing report every 5 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to advancing grid enhancement technologies; allows the department of public service to approve requests from distribution companies to develop grid enhancement technologies; requires distribution companies to submit a compliance filing report every 5 years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-23Assemblytabled
2024-12-21Assemblyvetoed memo.119
2024-12-12Assemblydelivered to governor
2024-06-07SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-07Senate3RD READING CAL.1180
2024-06-07SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7868A
2024-05-30SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2024-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2024-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2024-05-30Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.263
2024-05-30Assemblyrules report cal.263
2024-05-30Assemblyreported
2024-05-21Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-17Assemblyprint number 9105a
2024-05-17Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to energy
2024-02-07Assemblyreferred to energy

Same As/Similar To

S07868 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9105A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A9105
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09105&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09105
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09105&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09105A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09105&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09105&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09105&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A9105#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback