NY A09095 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s6545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s6545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Micki Guy, a firefighter in the city of Glens Falls, in the county of Warren, to elect to participate in the optional 20 year retirement program.
Title
Authorizes Micki Guy, a firefighter in the city of Glens Falls, in the county of Warren, to elect to participate in the optional 20 year retirement program.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s6545 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.343 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.343 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06545 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.181