NY A09080 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a study of the number of children in foster care who have a developmental disability; provides such study shall include, but shall not be limited to, the following: assessing the demographics of the children in foster care with a developmental disability, including, but not limited to, their county of residence, age, race and gender identity, and determining whether the placement of such individuals in foster care was voluntary or court ordered; evaluating the current guidelines and regulations used to oversee the placement and treatment of children with a developmental disability; and analyzing the extent to which such age-appropriate children are prepared for a transition from foster care to an independent living situation.
Title
Relates to a study of the number of children in foster care who have a developmental disability; provides such study shall include, but shall not be limited to, the following: assessing the demographics of the children in foster care with a developmental disability, including, but not limited to, their county of residence, age, race and gender identity, and determining whether the placement of such individuals in foster care was voluntary or court ordered; evaluating the current guidelines and regulations used to oversee the placement and treatment of children with a developmental disability; and analyzing the extent to which such age-appropriate children are prepared for a transition from foster care to an independent living situation.
Sponsors
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Catalina Cruz [D] | Asm. Michaelle Solages [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-11-23 | Assembly | vetoed memo.59 |
2022-11-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1298 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8046A |
2022-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.621 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | print number 9080a |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to children and families |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S08046 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9080A