NY A09062 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits motor vehicle manufacturers and dealers from charging a subscription fee for certain functions of a motor vehicle after the vehicle is sold; provides that any manufacturer, dealer, or agent of a manufacturer or dealer that fails to comply with such requirements shall be assessed a civil penalty not to exceed two hundred fifty dollars per point of sale for each violation.
Title
Prohibits motor vehicle manufacturers and dealers from charging a subscription fee for certain functions of a motor vehicle after the vehicle is sold; provides that any manufacturer, dealer, or agent of a manufacturer or dealer that fails to comply with such requirements shall be assessed a civil penalty not to exceed two hundred fifty dollars per point of sale for each violation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.339 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.339 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 9062b |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | print number 9062a |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S08393 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES