NY A09062 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - signed chap.28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - signed chap.28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for professional development to educators; extends certain provisions of such law relating thereto.
Title
Provides for professional development to educators; extends certain provisions of such law relating thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | signed chap.28 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-05-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.399 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6955 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.624 |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-21 | Assembly | print number 9062a |
2014-03-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-03-12 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06955 (Same As) 2014-05-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9062A