NY A08986 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - signed chap.63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - signed chap.63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the public authorities law relating to the appointment of members of the Battery Park city authority, in relation to the qualifications of members of the Battery Park city authority.
Title
Amends the public authorities law relating to the appointment of members of the Battery Park city authority, in relation to the qualifications of members of the Battery Park city authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | signed chap.63 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-02-28 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.12 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7284 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.682 |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07284 (Same As) 2018-02-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8986