NY A08986 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax credit for farmers who make food donations to food banks or other public, charitable or not-for-profit emergency food programs.
Title
Establishes a tax credit for farmers who make food donations to food banks or other public, charitable or not-for-profit emergency food programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02768 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
A09164 (Same As) 2014-03-24 - referred to ways and means
A09164 (Same As) 2014-03-24 - referred to ways and means