NY A08983 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no motor vehicle repair shop shall repair a tire that would not pass New York state inspection.
Title
Provides that no motor vehicle repair shop shall repair a tire that would not pass New York state inspection.
Sponsors
Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Jaime Williams [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Joseph Errigo [R] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.174 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.174 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05000 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION