NY A08978 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing language access services to individuals relating to the tax abatement program for rent-controlled and rent-regulated property occupied by senior citizens or persons with disabilities.
Title
Relates to providing language access services to individuals relating to the tax abatement program for rent-controlled and rent-regulated property occupied by senior citizens or persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.545 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.640 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7054 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.839 |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S04789 (Same As) 2014-03-10 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S07054 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8978
S07054 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8978