NY A08972 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes a requirement for computing the age for public employees who have been absent on military duty to be eligible for a promotion.
Title
Changes a requirement for computing the age for public employees who have been absent on military duty to be eligible for a promotion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.72 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-03-02 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-03-02 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-03-02 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.433 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | substituted for a8972 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | referred to governmental employees |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.94 |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | substituted by s7170 |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.433 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07170 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.72