NY A08933 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - substituted by s7288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the rights of the first named insured on a commercial risk insurance policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the rights of the first named insured on a commercial risk insurance policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-29Assemblysubstituted by s7288
2018-01-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.617
2018-01-23Assemblyreported
2018-01-08Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S07288 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback