NY A08924 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - substituted by s7276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - substituted by s7276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the cardiopulmonary resuscitation report requirement for the division of state police.
Title
Removes the cardiopulmonary resuscitation report requirement for the division of state police.
Sponsors
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Assembly | substituted by s7276 |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.645 |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07276 (Same As) 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.6