NY S07276 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the cardiopulmonary resuscitation report requirement for the division of state police.
Title
Removes the cardiopulmonary resuscitation report requirement for the division of state police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.6 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.645 |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | substituted for a8924 |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2018-01-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.4 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08924 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - substituted by s7276