NY A08923 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends procedures required for the custodial interrogation of children to provide additional protections and for taking juveniles and sixteen and seventeen year olds into custody.
Title
Amends procedures required for the custodial interrogation of children to provide additional protections and for taking juveniles and sixteen and seventeen year olds into custody.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | print number 8923a |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2024-01-26 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S01099 (Same As) 2024-03-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES