NY A08904 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - advanced to third reading cal.643
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - advanced to third reading cal.643
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines a serious condition regarding the medical use of marihuana as a severe debilitating or life-threatening condition, or symptom or complication of the condition or its treatment, for which, in the practitioner's professional opinion and review of past treatments, the patient is likely to receive therapeutic or palliative benefit from primary or adjunctive treatment with medical use of medical marihuana.
Title
Defines a serious condition regarding the medical use of marihuana as a severe debilitating or life-threatening condition, or symptom or complication of the condition or its treatment, for which, in the practitioner's professional opinion and review of past treatments, the patient is likely to receive therapeutic or palliative benefit from primary or adjunctive treatment with medical use of medical marihuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.643 |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07755 (Same As) 2018-02-16 - REFERRED TO HEALTH