NY A08898 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms the actions of the Huntington union free school district regardless of the failure of such district to timely file final building cost reports.
Title
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms the actions of the Huntington union free school district regardless of the failure of such district to timely file final building cost reports.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Senate | tabled |
2020-11-27 | Senate | vetoed memo.62 |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1010 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7038 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.82 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.82 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-12-30 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07038 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - tabled
S02976 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.129
A04771 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.129
S02976 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.129
A04771 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.129