NY A08898 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.208
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.208
Summary
Relates to the implementation of the terms of a written agreement between CUNY and its employee organization; appropriates funds therefor.
Title
Relates to the implementation of the terms of a written agreement between CUNY and its employee organization; appropriates funds therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-11 | signed chap.208 | |
2009-07-10 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-09 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-09 | REPASSED SENATE | |
2009-06-30 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-06-30 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-06-30 | 3RD READING CAL.714 | |
2009-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5967 | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-18 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-18 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-18 | ordered to third reading rules cal.518 | |
2009-06-18 | rules report cal.518 | |
2009-06-18 | reported | |
2009-06-18 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-17 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-12 | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05967 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.208
S50026 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - PASSED SENATE
S64341 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65052 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S50026 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - PASSED SENATE
S64341 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65052 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08898&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |