NY A08881 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - print number 8881a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - print number 8881a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Redefines reckless driving to be dangerous driving; imposes stronger penalties where physical injury occurs and provides that a driver may be convicted without a showing of multiple violations or an awareness of the risk of harm.
Title
Redefines reckless driving to be dangerous driving; imposes stronger penalties where physical injury occurs and provides that a driver may be convicted without a showing of multiple violations or an awareness of the risk of harm.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Assembly | print number 8881a |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-12-18 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07894 (Same As) 2020-02-28 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION