NY A08862 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.267
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.267
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends, from December 31, 2014 to December 31, 2015, the expiration of the authorization granted to residential property owners in high risk brush fire areas on Staten Island to cut and remove reeds from their property.
Title
Extends, from December 31, 2014 to December 31, 2015, the expiration of the authorization granted to residential property owners in high risk brush fire areas on Staten Island to cut and remove reeds from their property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | signed chap.267 |
2014-08-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.888 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6656 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.544 |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | reported |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06656 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8862