NY A08837 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires utility companies to include on their bills notice of any and all public hearings concerning rate hikes.
Title
Requires utility companies to include on their bills notice of any and all public hearings concerning rate hikes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.677 |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-12-22 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04717 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS